KNOX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donates money to local/national worthy charities at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 13 April 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERRY KNOX | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FAIRFAX CHARLES COLIN KNOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMMA MARY ANN WATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £950 | £250 | £700 | £3.25k | £155 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
A) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN MERSHAM IN THE COUNTY OF KENT IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF LAND TO BE USED FOR RECREATION PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND SUCH OTHER AMENITIES AND FACILITIES AS NOT PROVIDED FROM PUBLIC FUNDS. B) AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND OBJECTS WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MERSHAM, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHERRIES
DICKSONS BOURNE
ALDINGTON
ASHFORD
TN25 7AH
- Phone:
- 01233500003
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window