Financial history MERE GREEN 0-5

Charity number: 1019905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £86.89k £72.72k £82.87k £60.28k £93.35k
Total expenditure £81.77k £73.32k £88.49k £59.63k £80.55k
Income from government contracts £61.42k £43.82k £55.58k £42.00k £65.05k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A