FRIENDS OF MILDMAY

Charity number: 1019926
Charity reporting is 312 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 Not yet received
312 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not yet received
312 days overdue
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 08 June 2017 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 07 July 2016 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)