FRIENDS OF MILDMAY

Charity number: 1019926
Charity reporting is overdue by 544 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £1.84k £6.68k £6.40k £766 £294
Total expenditure £14.46k £5.74k £7.10k £3.65k £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A