Friends of Three Rivers

Charity number: 1019943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.65k £22.31k £38.63k £21.87k £15.23k
Total expenditure £7.58k £10.46k £41.29k £26.46k £17.29k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A