Financial history FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS

Charity number: 1019969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.27m £2.21m £2.43m £2.44m £2.12m
Total expenditure £2.22m £2.51m £2.70m £2.72m £2.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £66.66k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09k £30.05k £44.11k £106.91k £0
Income - Other trading activities £39.88k £38.65k £36.35k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.12m £2.11m £2.25m £2.23m £2.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95.34k £15.62k £87.85k £93.99k £80.95k
Income - Other £15.19k £12.13k £9.09k £13.70k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.21m £2.51m £2.70m £2.72m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.57k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £106.11k £137.89k £109.13k £74.89k £41.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.57k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0