LITTLE ASHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school and Forest School for children 2 - 4 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £102,000 from 9 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 April 1993: Standard registration
- GREAT BRICKHILL PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Samantha Charlotte Chepkin | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart waknell | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
katie simmons | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Moore Mrs | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pelham Warren | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Whitehouse | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.02k | £64.47k | £122.38k | £114.58k | £133.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.82k | £51.96k | £112.59k | £129.24k | £149.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.30k | £37.55k | £74.41k | N/A | £102.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1992, AMENDED 19TH APRIL 1994, 1 MAY 1996, 1 NOVEMBER 2004, AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE PLAYGROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Ashes Pre School
Great Brickhill Parish Hall
Rotten Row
Great Brickhill
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 9BA
- Phone:
- 07855215154
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window