TONBRIDGE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020254
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 July 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 March 2017 On time Download