Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LONDON ACADEMY

Charity number: 1020310
Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 November 2022 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 January 2020 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required