TYNDALE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To mark the quincentenary of the birth of William Tyndale to advance public knowledge of his life and work and especially his translations of the bible into English and to acknowledge the inspiration his translations have been to succeeding generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 April 1993: Standard registration
- WILLIAM TYNDALE QUINCENTENARY TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH POLLARD DR | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SURTEES | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guido Latre | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROCHELLE GIVONI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY CLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr BARRY RYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28k | £3.66k | £5.67k | £6.08k | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £6.62k | £5.00k | £2.68k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO MARK THE QUINCENTENARY OF THE BIRTH OF WILLIAM TYNDALE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF HIS LIFE AND WORK AND ESPECIALLY HIS TRANSLATIONS OF THE BIBLE INTO ENGLISH AND TO ACKNOWLEDE THE INSPIRATION HIS TRANSLATIONS HAVE BEEN TO SUCCEEDING GENERATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 ST. PAULS CRESCENT
OXFORD
OX2 9AG
- Phone:
- 07983 610331
- Email:
- tyndale.society@aol.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window