Trustees BLANDFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1020421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sybille Maddock Chair 07 June 2019
None on record
Caroline Wawman Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Christopher Bartlett Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Michael Booth Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Jonathan Bowell Trustee 07 June 2019
None on record
Samantha Elliott Trustee 22 April 2013
None on record