CHESHIRE DANCE WORKSHOP LIMITED

Charity number: 1020584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shamima Noor Trustee 20 May 2020
UTOPIA THEATRE Recently registered
Gillian Whitworth Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Tracey Oultram Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Bettina Carpi Trustee 13 May 2014 None on record
Janet Halloran Chair 12 January 2016 None on record
Josh Slater Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Shelley Owen Trustee 26 February 2020 None on record
Nina Osbaldeston Trustee 26 June 2017 None on record