MAESTEG ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1020630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £99.65k £123.49k £109.47k £92.54k £80.54k
Total expenditure £92.03k £98.19k £106.63k £96.51k £91.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A