Financial history INTERNATIONAL SERVICE FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1020758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.50m £3.17m £2.72m £3.03m £2.28m
Total expenditure £2.86m £2.91m £3.64m £2.70m £2.55m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £34.78k £20.69k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.40m £3.07m £2.64m £2.96m £2.21m
Income - Other trading activities £268 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £102.40k £100.49k £77.96k £72.55k £64.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £46.77k £60.64k £54.37k £47.99k £34.93k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £176.33k £451.07k £379.97k £690.69k £95.40k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.70m £2.76m £3.58m £2.63m £2.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £162.14k £153.59k £64.63k £76.67k £103.33k
Expenditure - Governance £42.84k £53.53k £33.48k £32.76k £44.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £50.00k £15.00k £15.00k £30.00k £10.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £2.37k £2.42k £10.23k £1.91k £1.91k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0