Financial history SUTTON AND ERDINGTON MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020820
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £120.05k £156.75k £151.17k £119.86k £101.23k
Total expenditure £53.62k £161.98k £241.64k £103.21k £104.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A