THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH

Charity number: 1020916
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)