Trustees 4TH HESWALL (ST PETERS) SEA SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1020985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ASHWORTH | Chair | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jane Everett | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwenan Jackson | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Agata Casson | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Moore | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Johnson | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Egerton | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cannam | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dennis | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Baker | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Everett | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK SARGENT | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BARKER | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY GORDON HAILWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS BERNIE HAILWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.