Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF RYE AND WINCHELSEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1021030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £7.34k £6.74k £5.45k £9.88k £7.93k
Total expenditure £6.93k £6.71k £7.30k £6.71k £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A