WALLINGFORD CHAMELEON ARTS

Charity number: 1021045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.75k £22.86k £21.67k £42.42k £6.62k
Total expenditure £18.06k £20.25k £21.93k £17.54k £8.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A