WALLINGFORD CHAMELEON ARTS

Charity number: 1021045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER HOWEL GILES MORGAN Trustee None on record
Julia Astrid Cottee Trustee 10 March 2021 None on record
JULIAN ROBERT GALLOP Trustee 23 July 2012 None on record
Katherine Elizabeth Spence Trustee 10 March 2021 None on record
John Pritchard Trustee 09 October 2014 None on record
LAURENCE ATTEWILL Chair 14 September 2011 None on record
Dr David Raymond Pick Trustee 19 February 2019 None on record
JEREMY JONATHAN BOUGHTON Trustee None on record