KENT, SURREY & SUSSEX AIR AMBULANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1021367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.20m £12.43m £14.11m £14.84m £16.27m
Total expenditure £9.36m £9.56m £10.97m £14.14m £15.43m
Income from government contracts £0 £623.00k £623.52k £1.20m £1.48m
Income from government grants £1.85m £0 £1.00m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.93m £4.00m £5.21m £4.13m £4.37m
Income - Other trading activities £6.00m £6.49m £6.86m £8.00m £8.73m
Income - Charitable activities £1.26m £767.87k £694.50k £1.32m £1.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £75.04k £186.45k £212.25k £331.42k £307.70k
Income - Other £942.55k £981.83k £1.14m £1.06m £1.19m
Income - Legacies £2.14m £2.16m £2.80m £2.57m £3.02m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.72m £6.77m £8.19m £10.22m £11.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.64m £2.79m £2.78m £3.92m £3.95m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £42.88k £32.99k £59.42k £134.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0