Accounts and annual returns HORLEY ROW COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1021426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window