Financial history HORLEY ROW COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1021426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £86.01k £78.83k £132.88k £109.13k £116.37k
Total expenditure £71.90k £74.47k £107.86k £113.30k £109.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.00k N/A N/A