Trustees 2ND MORTLAKE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1021519
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward de Waal | Chair | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Sanjay Chhaganlal Makan | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie O'Neile | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Fleur Barns | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth Wincott | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rachel Earl | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Eilish Young | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Powell Eden | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Louise Haarhoff | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Julian Oddy | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hubbard | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Choudhury | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Frances Tracey | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WINCOTT | Trustee | 01 May 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.