Financial history TILLINGHAM ST NICHOLAS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £33.12k £32.55k £27.04k £14.08k £8.02k
Total expenditure £17.21k £17.79k £19.56k £9.65k £1.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A