STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST

Charity number: 1021780
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 220 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 585 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required