STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST

Charity number: 1021780
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £411 £481 £562 £566 £505
Total expenditure £375 £560 £200 £350 £525
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A