CARING AND SHARING ASSOCIATION EAST SUSSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the disadvantaged in certain developing countries as detailed in our report and accounts. We cannot reply to unsolicited requests for help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- Brazil
- Colombia
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Honduras
- India
- Peru
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 02 June 1993: Standard registration
- BISHOP OF LEWES CARING AND SHARING EAST SUSSEX (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen White | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS JAMES | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Holly Stevenson | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Maling | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE READE | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV HUGH MARTIN MOSELEY BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIET MARY LYON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.67k | £55.02k | £60.92k | £46.29k | £42.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.90k | £39.70k | £69.94k | £49.59k | £42.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE PROJECTS FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS OR THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF COUNTRIES IN THE THIRD WORLD.
Area of benefit
THIRD WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
The Normans
Normandale
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3NU
- Phone:
- 07864 988444
- Email:
- flufflyholly@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window