Accounts and annual returns DR JAMES ALLAN BRAND'S WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1022222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 September 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 17 September 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2017 Not Required