Financial history DR JAMES ALLAN BRAND'S WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1022222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2017 17/09/2018 17/09/2019 17/09/2020 17/09/2021
Total gross income £5.31k £4.22k £5.10k £5.92k £4.21k
Total expenditure £5.43k £6.69k £5.10k £5.27k £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A