TAVISTOCK COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022328
Charity reporting is 248 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not yet received
248 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not yet received
248 days overdue
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 August 2019 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 August 2019 36 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 October 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 11 July 2017 11 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 08 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 08 June 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)