Trustees ST ANDREWS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1022398

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Davies | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carly Burgiss | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Amy Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rose Ward | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keira Roth | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gitte Mowatt | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Mowatt | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.