SEARS GROUP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO AID EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF ANY COMPANY THAT IS OR HAS BEEN ASSOCIATED WITH SEARS LIMITED, AS WELL AS THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS. THE TRUST'S OBJECTIVE IS THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED WHETHER CAUSED BY REASON OF AGE OR SICKNESS OR HOWSOEVER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Sellars | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lindsey Huscroft | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Mary Hannell | Trustee | 28 April 1994 |
|
|
||||
Sears Group Trustees Limited | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £371.61k | £348.18k | £309.20k | £346.12k | £383.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £404.34k | £402.87k | £390.54k | £415.72k | £467.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 18 FEBRUARY 1997 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 27 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST ANY PERSONS WHO ARE EMPLOYEES OF A COMPANY AT A TIME WHEN IT IS A SUBSIDIARY OF SEARS PLC OR WHO WERE EMPLOYEES OF A COMPANY WHEN IT WAS A SUBSIDIARY OF SEARS PLC AND THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Trust Partnership Ltd
6 Trull Farm Buildings
Trull
TETBURY
GL8 8SQ
- Phone:
- 07702520752
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window