Accounts and annual returns SELECTIVE MUTISM INFORMATION AND RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1022673
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required