Accounts and annual returns HAROLD AND MARJORIE MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1022715
Charity reporting is overdue by 357 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 357 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 357 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2022 357 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 November 2020 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 09 November 2020 278 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 12 June 2019 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 12 June 2019 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 June 2018 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 11 June 2018 126 days late Download Open in new window