THE ROYAL KENT SCHOOL AND LADYBIRD NURSERY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation undertakes social and fundraising events with the intention of:- 1. Promoting extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school. 2. Supporting the school in the educational advancement of the pupils attending the school. 3. Providing and assisting in the provision of equipment and facilities not normally provided by LEA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
- Royal Kent School Oxshott PTA (Working name)
- THE ROYAL KENT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ralph | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Miller | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Wasley | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katelitsa Gilbert | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Yara Pais-Atherton | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Delgado Quintela | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elisabeth Jansson Heeks | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hancock | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Blaney | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.96k | £45.68k | £17.58k | £22.13k | £22.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.13k | £36.01k | £35.99k | £17.47k | £10.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 03 April 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 03 April 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1992 as amended on 29 Nov 2020 as amended on 29 Nov 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: - Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school - Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXSHOTT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Kent C Of E School
Oakshade Road
Oxshott
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT22 0LE
- Phone:
- 01372842495
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window