ADVOCACY IN WIRRAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 17 June 1993: Standard registration
- 28 March 2000: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 March 2000: Funds transferred to 1070389 AIW HEALTH
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 1993, 3 APRIL 1995 AND 14 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF ALL ADULTS UNDER THE AGE OF 65 WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN WIRRAL AND WHO HAVE OR HAVE HAD MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, AND THEIR CARERS, BY (1) THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF WIRRAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.