FRIENDS OF WROTHAM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Qiuz Nights Uniform Sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
Governance
- 18 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Reeve | Chair | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paula Helen Martin | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SEAN PATRICK PRENTICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.83k | £6.92k | £8.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.54k | £3.31k | £8.18k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 CHURCH ROAD
WEST KINGSDOWN
SEVENOAKS
TN15 6LN
- Phone:
- 01474853093
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window