FRIENDS OF ST OWENS BROMHAM

Charity number: 1022947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £93.93k £71.90k £75.58k £118.99k £132.01k
Total expenditure £2.67k £55.14k £24.25k £70.51k £156.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A