ALAN CAVE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1022983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 March 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 February 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 July 2018 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required