ALAN CAVE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1022983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.56k £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.83k £0 £1.50k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A