Financial history 1ST LLANDRINDOD WELLS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1023130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.02k £13.16k £18.78k £11.31k £17.17k
Total expenditure £7.99k £13.02k £20.39k £10.75k £13.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A