COLSTONS PARENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1023308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £12.42k £12.66k £11.96k £12.15k £21.66k
Total expenditure £11.90k £2.15k £3.98k £5.82k £28.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A