BURTON LATIMER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 December 2017 On time Download