Financial history BURTON LATIMER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £43.63k £43.64k £43.37k £37.47k £50.04k
Total expenditure £43.72k £44.49k £43.65k £39.00k £34.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £2.50k N/A £46.13k