Accounts and annual returns NEW LIVING MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1023328
Charity reporting is overdue by 138 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 138 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 138 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window