Financial history WEST NORFOLK DEAF CHILDRENS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1023338
Charity reporting is overdue by 1465 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £837 £743 £129 £6 £6
Total expenditure £588 £1.68k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A