Financial history THE DRINKS TRUST

Charity number: 1023376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £801.90k £848.90k £949.01k £2.40m £1.36m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.17m £1.26m £2.05m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £429.50k £475.53k £503.77k £2.03m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £294.70k £0
Income - Charitable activities £313.02k £302.14k £356.10k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £59.27k £71.24k £89.13k £74.26k £50.82k
Income - Other £110 £0 £0 £0 £174.05k
Income - Legacies £5.44k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £810.37k £849.80k £897.23k £1.71m £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £286.84k £323.25k £360.19k £342.16k £319.62k
Expenditure - Governance £24.38k £28.93k £29.39k £41.42k £44.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £45.88k £58.03k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0