Trustees THE DRINKS TRUST
Charity number: 1023376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY LAWRENCE | Chair | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Anthony Burrell | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Willoughby | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Keating | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Forrest | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Peter Barker | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Smith | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Difford | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.