Financial history Seaham Music Academy

Charity number: 1023382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £66.01k £53.27k £44.57k £17.77k £12.52k
Total expenditure £66.01k £47.38k £45.97k £14.18k £14.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.00k N/A N/A N/A